TN SJR0067 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes application for the calling of an Article V convention under the United States Constitution to consider amendments to impose fiscal restraints on the federal government, limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and limit the terms of office for its officials and for members of Congress.
Title
As introduced, makes application for the calling of an Article V convention under the United States Constitution to consider amendments to impose fiscal restraints on the federal government, limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and limit the terms of office for its officials and for members of Congress.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Mark Green [R] |
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 59 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 57 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 66 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recomend for Adoption (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 57 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 66 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recomend for Adoption (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-02-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-02-04 | House | Concurred, Ayes 59, Nays 31, PNV 1 |
2016-02-02 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/4/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/2/2016 |
2016-01-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 1/26/2016 |
2015-04-20 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 23, Nays 5, PNV 2 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means until 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |