TN SJR0067 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Designates March 13, 2011, as "K-9 Veterans Day" in Tennessee.
Title
Designates March 13, 2011, as "K-9 Veterans Day" in Tennessee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-04-26 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-04-26 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-04-25 | Concurred, Ayes 98, Nays 0 | |
2011-04-19 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/25/2011 | |
2011-04-15 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Rec. for Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 4/12/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-07 | Ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-03-03 | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2011-03-01 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 3/3/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Rec. for adoption, by S. S&L Gov. Comm., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-03-01 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/1/2011 | |
2011-02-28 | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. S&L Gov. Comm. 3/1/11 | |
2011-02-14 | P2C, ref. to S. S & L Gov. Comm. | |
2011-02-10 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-09 | Filed for intro. |