TN SJR0059 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges President Donald J. Trump and Congress to distribute federal transportation funding to the states by block grant.
Title
Urges President Donald J. Trump and Congress to distribute federal transportation funding to the states by block grant.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Steve Southerland [R] |
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 66 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-09 | House | Concurred, Ayes 66, Nays 17, PNV 0 |
2017-05-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-02-23 | House | Rcvd. from S., ref. to Transportation Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 2, PNV 1 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/16/2017 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/14/2017 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |