TN SJR0058 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the Nation of Israel.
Title
Expresses support for the Nation of Israel.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] | Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] |
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-03-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-25 | House | Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2019-02-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Adopted as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0005) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/21/2019 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Recommended for adoption with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/12/2019 |
2019-01-19 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |