TN SJR0057 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Ref. to Naming & Designating
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Ref. to Naming & Designating
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Williams Syndrome Awareness Month," May 2021
Title
A RESOLUTION to designate May 2021 as "Williams Syndrome Awareness Month" in Tennessee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Ref. to Naming & Designating |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |