TN SJR0055 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes transmittal of the state budget document for fiscal year 2019-2020 by Monday, March 4, 2019; authorizes filing of budget legislation by Monday, March 11, 2019.
Title
Authorizes transmittal of the state budget document for fiscal year 2019-2020 by Monday, March 4, 2019; authorizes filing of budget legislation by Monday, March 11, 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0055&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SJR0055.pdf |