TN SJR0053 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-10 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Bill Marrs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor the memory of Bill Marrs of Rockwood.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-10SenateSigned by Governor.
2023-02-06SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2023-02-06HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-02-03SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-02-03SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-02-02HouseConcurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
2023-02-01HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/2/2023
2023-01-30SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-01-30SenateAdopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2023-01-27SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 1/30/2023
2023-01-25SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-01-24SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-23SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback