TN SJR0052 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Bishop Felton M. Smith, Jr.
Title
Bishop Felton M. Smith, Jr.
Sponsors
Sen. Lowe Finney [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-02-23 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-02-23 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-02-23 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-02-23 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-02-23 | Concurred, Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2011-02-17 | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/23/11 | |
2011-02-17 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-02-17 | Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0 | |
2011-02-15 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 1 cal. for 2/17/2011 | |
2011-02-14 | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-02-10 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-09 | Filed for intro. |