TN SJR0051 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Jo Beryl Harrell

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor the memory of Jo Beryl Harrell of Johnson City.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseConcurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-02-25HouseConcurred, Ayes 0, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-02-24HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/25/2021
2021-02-22SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-02-22SenateAdopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2021-02-17SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/22/2021
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-19SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback