TN SJR0051 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-28 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

City of Johnson City, sesquicentennial

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Johnson City, sesquicentennial

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-28SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-01-25SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-01-25HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-01-24SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-01-24SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-01-23HouseConcurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-01-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 1-23-19
2019-01-18HouseObjected to on Consent Calendar.
2019-01-10HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for for 1-18-19
2019-01-10SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-01-10SenateAdopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-01-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, Held on desk pending committee appointments
2019-01-09SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 1/10/2019
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-08SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback