TN SJR0051 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Reverend Joseph Patrick Breen.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reverend Joseph Patrick Breen.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-13SenateSigned by Governor.
2015-02-13SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2015-02-10HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2015-02-10SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2015-02-10SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2015-02-09HouseConcurred, Ayes 97, Nays 0
2015-02-05HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/9/15
2015-01-17SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-01-17SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2015-01-17SenateRules Suspended, Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2015-01-17SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-01-17SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 1/17/2015
2015-01-16SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback