TN SJR0051 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Elaine Hewitt

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elaine Hewitt

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-12SenateSigned by Governor.
2013-02-11SenateTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2013-02-07SenateSigned by H. Speaker
2013-02-07SenateSigned by S. Speaker
2013-02-07SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2013-02-06SenateConcurred, Ayes 91, Nays 0
2013-02-05SenateSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/6/13
2013-02-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2013-02-04SenateAdopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2013-02-01SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 2/4/2013
2013-01-30SenateP2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
2013-01-28SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-23SenateFiled for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback