TN SJR0049 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to General Sub
Pending: House Civil Justice Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to General Sub
Pending: House Civil Justice Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to propose to the states for ratification an amendment stating that the United States Supreme Court shall be composed of nine justices.
Title
A RESOLUTION to support a constitutional amendment to set the number of United States Supreme Court Justices at nine.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to General Sub |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 5/4/2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2021-03-04 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 27, Nays 6 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/1/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/23/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/16/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |