TN SJR0047 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Charles T. Floyd

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charles T. Floyd

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-09 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-17 Signed by Governor.
2011-02-10 Transmitted to Gov. for action.
2011-02-10 Signed by H. Speaker
2011-02-10 Enrolled and ready for signatures
2011-02-10 Signed by S. Speaker
2011-02-09 R/S Concurred, v.v.
2011-02-09 Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
2011-02-09 R/S Adopted v.v.
2011-02-09 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-08 Filed for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback