TN SJR0044 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Fulton High School football team, TSSAA BlueCross Bowl Division I, Class 4A champion
Title
Fulton High School football team, TSSAA BlueCross Bowl Division I, Class 4A champion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 91, Nays 0 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/6/13 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 2/4/2013 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Filed for intro. |