TN SJR0034 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-25 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud. Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-25 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud. Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination and preferences in government.
Title
Prohibits discrimination and preferences in government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud. Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud. Comm. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0034&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SJR0034.pdf |