TN SJR0033 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Dr. Claude O. Pressnell, Jr.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to recognize Dr. Claude O. Pressnell, Jr., for his many contributions to higher education in the State of Tennessee and beyond.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-02-11SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-02-11SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-02-10HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-02-10SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-02-09SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-02-08HouseConcurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-01-15HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/8/2021
2021-01-15SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-01-15SenateAdopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2021-01-15SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-01-15SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 1/15/2021
2021-01-14SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-13SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback