TN SJR0030 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Confirms the appointment of persons to the state university board of Middle Tennessee State University.
Title
Confirms the appointment of persons to the state university board of Middle Tennessee State University.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-02-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-02-13 | House | Concurred, Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/6/2017 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/1/2017 |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |