TN SJR0017 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Chris Bundgaard

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to recognize Chris Bundgaard of the Capitol Hill Press Corps on the occasion of his retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-20SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-01-20SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-01-19HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-01-19SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-01-19SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-01-15HouseConcurred, Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 3
2021-01-14HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 1/15/21
2021-01-14SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-01-14SenateAdopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2021-01-13SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 1/14/2021
2021-01-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-11SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback