TN SJR0013 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-31 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Terry Schneider, Rutherford County Chamber of Commerce 2022 Leadership Rutherford Pinnacle Award

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to recognize and honor Terry Schneider upon being named the 2022 Rutherford County Chamber of Commerce Leadership Rutherford Pinnacle Award winner.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-31SenateSigned by Governor.
2023-01-25SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2023-01-24HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-01-24SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-01-24SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-01-20HouseConcurred, Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0
2023-01-13HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 1/20/2023
2023-01-13SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-01-12SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-01-12SenateAdopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2023-01-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-11SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 1/12/2023
2023-01-11SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback