TN SJR0011 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Placed on cal. Naming & Designating for 3/2/2021
Pending: House Naming & Designating Committee
Hearing: Mar 2 @ 12:00 pm in House Hearing Room I
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

"Certified Government Financial Manager Month," March 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to designate March 2021 as "Certified Government Financial Manager Month" in Tennessee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HousePlaced on cal. Naming & Designating for 3/2/2021
2021-02-22HouseRef. to Naming & Designating
2021-02-11SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-02-11SenateAdopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2021-02-09SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/11/2021
2021-02-09SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2021-02-03SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/9/2021
2021-01-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-12-11SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback