TN SJR0006 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-5)
Status: Passed on February 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-03 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-5)
Status: Passed on February 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-03 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Principal Linda Buggs and the teachers of Grand Junction Elementary School
Title
Principal Linda Buggs and the teachers of Grand Junction Elementary School
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-02-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-02-02 | House | Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2017-02-01 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/2/17 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 1/30/2017 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |