TN SB9019 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-09 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "No Patient Left Alone Act." - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to establishing uniform standards regarding restrictions relative to COVID-19.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-09HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-10-28SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 10/28/2021
2021-10-28SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2021-10-28SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 10/28/2021
2021-10-28SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2021-10-27SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-10-27SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB9025 (Crossfiled) 2021-10-28 - No Action Taken

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback