TN SB8012 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on August 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-12 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires law enforcement officers and agents to clearly identify themselves as officers or agents, as applicable, when arresting a person during a protest or demonstration. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 12; Title 38; Title 39; Title 58 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires law enforcement officers and agents to clearly identify themselves as officers or agents, as applicable, when arresting a person during a protest or demonstration. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 12; Title 38; Title 39; Title 58 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-12SenateFailed in Senate Judiciary Committee
2020-08-12SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 8/12/2020
2020-08-11SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 8/12/2020
2020-08-11SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 8/11/2020
2020-08-11SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Judiciary Comm. 8-11-20
2020-08-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2020-08-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-08-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB8010 (Crossfiled) 2020-08-12 - P2C, ref. to Public Safety Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback