TN SB8009 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-08-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts "Tennessee COVID-19 Recovery Act." - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 3; Title 29, Chapter 34; Title 29, Chapter 20 and Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts "Tennessee COVID-19 Recovery Act." - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 3; Title 29, Chapter 34; Title 29, Chapter 20 and Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-12SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2020-08-12SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 8/12/2020
2020-08-11SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 8/12/2020
2020-08-11SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 8/11/2020
2020-08-11SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Judiciary Comm. 8-11-20
2020-08-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2020-08-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-08-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB8013 (Crossfiled) 2020-08-12 - Intro., P1C.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback