TN SB8002 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-20 - Pub. Ch. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-20 - Pub. Ch. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts "Tennessee COVID-19 Recovery Act." - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 3; Title 29, Chapter 34; Title 29, Chapter 20 and Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, enacts "Tennessee COVID-19 Recovery Act." - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 3; Title 29, Chapter 34; Title 29, Chapter 20 and Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] |
Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] |
Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Table Amend# 4 by Yarbro (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Table Amend# 3 by Yarbro (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY STEWART PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 18 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-08-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 19 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-08-11 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Table Amend# 3 by Yarbro (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY STEWART PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 18 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-08-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 19 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-08-11 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Pub. Ch. 1 | |
2020-08-20 | Effective date(s) 8/17/2020 | |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-08-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-08-12 | House | Passed H., Ayes 80, Nays 10, PNV 1 |
2020-08-12 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA8010) |
2020-08-12 | House | Failed to adopt, Ayes 18, Nays 71, PNV 1 |
2020-08-12 | House | Failed to adopt, Ayes 19, Nays 72, PNV 0 |
2020-08-12 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 4 |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Amendment #4 tabled |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Amendment #3 tabled |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Amendment #2 tabled |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA8001) |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 8/12/2020 |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 8/11/2020 |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Judiciary Comm. 8-11-20 |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB8001 (Crossfiled) 2020-08-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1