TN SB7074 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-23 - Lay on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the governor to expand medicaid for mental health prevention and treatment pursuant to the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act; authorizes the governor to negotiate with the federal centers for medicare and medicaid services to determine the terms of the expansion. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 33 and Title 71, relative to expanding Medicaid to provide mental health services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-23SenateLay on the Table
2023-08-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2023-08-21SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 8/23/2023
2023-08-21SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-08-21SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB7069 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-22 - Failed in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback