TN SB7050 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-08-23 - Lay on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department of education to establish a school bulletproofing grant program to provide grants to public schools located in counties with a crime rate of 13 percent or higher for violent offenses, for the purpose of offsetting expenses for the installation of bulletproof film on doors and windows. - Amends TCA Title 9; Title 49; Title 67 and Chapter 367 of the Public Acts of 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9; Title 49; Title 67 and Chapter 367 of the Public Acts of 2023, relative to educational expenses for school safety plans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-23SenateLay on the Table
2023-08-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2023-08-21SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 8/23/2023
2023-08-21SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-08-21SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB7096 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback