TN SB7041 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-08-23 - Lay on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-08-23 - Lay on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to report in detail to the general assembly the types of threats of violence reported by LEAs and public charter schools and include its findings and any recommendations related to school safety; requires the report to be submitted by January 1 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 49 and Chapter 367 of the Public Acts of 2023.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 49 and Chapter 367 of the Public Acts of 2023, relative to school safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-23 | Senate | Lay on the Table |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 8/23/2023 |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB7097 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration