TN SB7011 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Lay on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a Class E felony of threatened mass violence for the reckless handling, display, or discharge of a firearm while operating, or as a passenger in, a motor vehicle. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 55.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 55, relative to acts of mass violence.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-22SenateLay on the Table
2023-08-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-08-21SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 8/22/2023
2023-08-21SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-08-18SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB7047 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-22 - Tabled

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback