TN SB7009 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Pub. Ch. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes appropriations sufficient to provide the first year's funding for any act which receives final passage during the first extraordinary session of the 112th General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to make appropriations for the purpose of defraying the expenses of the state government for the fiscal years beginning July 1, 2020, and July 1, 2021, in the administration, operation, and maintenance of the legislative, executive, and judicial branches of the various departments, institutions, offices, and agencies of the state; for certain state aid and obligations; for capital outlay, for the service of the public debt, for emergency and contingency; to repeal certain appropriations and any acts inconsistent herewith; to provide provisional continuing appropriations; and to establish certain provisions, limitations, and restrictions under which appropriations may be obligated and expended. This act makes appropriations for the purposes described above for the fiscal years beginning July 1, 2020, and July 1, 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09 Pub. Ch. 4
2021-02-09 Effective date(s) 02/03/2021
2021-02-03SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-01-27SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-01-26HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-01-26SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-01-22SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-01-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendment #2
2021-01-22HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1
2021-01-22HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA7008)
2021-01-22HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA7007)
2021-01-22HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA7006)
2021-01-22HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA7005)
2021-01-22HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-01-21SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 23, Nays 5
2021-01-21SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0010)
2021-01-21SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-01-21SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 1/21/2021
2021-01-21SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 1
2021-01-20SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 1/21/2021
2021-01-20SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-15SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB7020 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 4

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback