TN SB7002 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Learning Loss Remediation and Student Acceleration Act"; requires local education agencies and public charter schools to implement a program of after-school learning mini-camps, learning loss bridge camps, and summer learning camps to remediate student learning loss. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to the Tennessee Learning Loss Remediation and Student Acceleration Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1
2021-01-21SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-01-21SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 1/21/2021
2021-01-21SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 1 PNV 0
2021-01-20SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 1/21/2021
2021-01-20SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2021-01-20SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 1/20/2021
2021-01-20SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-14SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB7004 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-09 - Pub. Ch. 1

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB7002&ga=112
Texthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/SB7002.pdf
Texthttps://publications.tnsosfiles.com/acts/112/extra/pc0001EOS.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/SA0004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/SA0006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/SA0007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/SA0008.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/SA0009.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/SB7002.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/FM0007.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/FM0003.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/FM0013.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/FM0015.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/FM0012.pdf
Roll Callhttps://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB7002&ga=112

Bill Comments

feedback