TN SB7001 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-08-23 - Lay on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-08-23 - Lay on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each LEA, public charter school, private school, and church-related school to develop a policy to direct how students, teachers, substitute teachers, and staff are to respond when a fire alarm is activated on school premises outside of a scheduled fire drill to protect students, teachers, substitute teachers, and staff in the event the fire alarm was activated due to the presence of an active shooter on school premises. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 49 and Chapter 367 of the Public Acts of 2023.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 49 and Chapter 367 of the Public Acts of 2023, relative to safety precautions taken in response to potential active shooter situations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-23 | Senate | Lay on the Table |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 8/23/2023 |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-08-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB7002 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-28 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration