TN SB3919 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-28 - Pub. Ch. 1108
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-28 - Pub. Ch. 1108
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes appropriations for fiscal years 2009-2010 and 2010-2011.
Title
As enacted, makes appropriations for fiscal years 2009-2010 and 2010-2011.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 10 BY Tracy (Y: 3 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 11 BY McNally (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 10 BY Tracy (Y: 3 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 11 BY McNally (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-28 | Pub. Ch. 1108 | |
2010-06-28 | Effective date(s) 07/01/10 | |
2010-06-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-14 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-09 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-04 | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-04 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1611) | |
2010-06-04 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - HA1655) | |
2010-06-04 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1652) | |
2010-06-04 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-06-04 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-06-03 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 3 | |
2010-06-03 | Failed to adopt am. 10, Ayes 3, Nays 29 | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 9 - SA1546) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 8 - SA1534) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 7 - SA1533) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 6 - SA1531) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 5 - SA1530) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 4 - SA1529) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA1526) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA1525) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1524) | |
2010-06-03 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 11 of 0 - SA1571) | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 2 PNV 1 | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/26/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/26/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/25/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/25/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/24/2010 | |
2010-05-18 | Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to next cal. | |
2010-05-17 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/18/2010 | |
2010-05-17 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/18/2010 | |
2010-05-14 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/17/2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/18/2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/12/2010 | |
2010-05-11 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/12/2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/11/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/11/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/05/2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/5/2010 | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/04/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/4/2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/28/2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/28/2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/27/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/27/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | P2C, ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2010-02-08 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-02-08 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3928 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1108