TN SB3815 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 743
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 743
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions regarding distinguishable names for corporations and partnerships and application for use of a name that is not distinguishable. - Amends TCA Title 48 and Title 61.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions regarding distinguishable names for corporations and partnerships and application for use of a name that is not distinguishable. - Amends TCA Title 48 and Title 61.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-22 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 743 | |
2010-03-25 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA1003) | |
2010-03-25 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0826) | |
2010-03-25 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/25/2010 | |
2010-03-22 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 10 | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/22/2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Re-ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-02-22 | Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-02-19 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 02/22/2010 | |
2010-02-18 | S. Reset on Cal. for 2/22/2010 | |
2010-02-16 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 02/18/2010 | |
2010-02-09 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. comm Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2010-02-05 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 02/09/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3645 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 743