TN SB3551 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1148
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1148
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds two law enforcement members to the advisory committee on open government from the Tennessee sheriffs' association and the Tennessee association of chiefs of police and adds one member from the Society of Professional Journalists and one member from the American Association of Retired People to the committee.
Title
As enacted, adds two law enforcement members to the advisory committee on open government from the Tennessee sheriffs' association and the Tennessee association of chiefs of police and adds one member from the Society of Professional Journalists and one member from the American Association of Retired People to the committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Pub. Ch. 1148 | |
2010-07-06 | Effective date(s) 06/30/10 | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-23 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-22 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-09 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-06-04 | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-04 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-06-04 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-06-04 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 29, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-04 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0836) | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/04/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (3) cal. for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (3) cal. for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-05-28 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/01/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/26/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 5/27/10 | |
2010-02-10 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2010-02-05 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 02/10/2010 | |
2010-02-04 | Ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm. | |
2010-02-04 | Recalled from S. Jud. Comm. | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud. Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3634 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1148