TN SB3507 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1102
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1102
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, urges the comptroller, in conjunction with the department of environment and conservation and the department of revenue, to study laws and policies dealing with Tennessee's taxation of recycled products using a raw material in the manufacturing process; and investigate any tax policy or make any recommendation that would help promote Tennessee's businesses using more recycled material in their manufacturing process. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As enacted, urges the comptroller, in conjunction with the department of environment and conservation and the department of revenue, to study laws and policies dealing with Tennessee's taxation of recycled products using a raw material in the manufacturing process; and investigate any tax policy or make any recommendation that would help promote Tennessee's businesses using more recycled material in their manufacturing process. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 1102 | |
2012-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/21/12 | |
2012-05-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-05-09 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-05-08 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-05-04 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-05-01 | Passed H., Ayes 85, Nays 1, PNV 1 | |
2012-05-01 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1403) | |
2012-05-01 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-05-01 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-04-30 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-30 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1304) | |
2012-04-27 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-27 | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-26 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/27/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2012-04-24 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-23 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-20 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/23/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/23/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/18/2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/18/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/17/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/17/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-03 | Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. w/ recommend | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal. | |
2012-03-13 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/14/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to 3/14/12 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-02-07 | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2012-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2012-01-30 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3832 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1102