TN SB3428 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1128
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1128
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes municipal governments to create an office of administrative hearing officer to hear building and property maintenance code violations. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54 and Title 66.
Title
As enacted, authorizes municipal governments to create an office of administrative hearing officer to hear building and property maintenance code violations. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54 and Title 66.
Sponsors
Sen. Lowe Finney [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY Yager (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY Yager (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Pub. Ch. 1128 | |
2010-07-06 | Effective date(s) 07/01/10 | |
2010-06-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-23 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-22 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-09 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-06-05 | S. concurred in H. am. 2 | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 06/05/2010 | |
2010-06-04 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-04 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA1608) | |
2010-06-04 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1116) | |
2010-06-04 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-05-17 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-05-13 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-05-13 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-13 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1444) | |
2010-05-13 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1053) | |
2010-05-11 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/13/2010 | |
2010-05-10 | S. Reset on cal. for 05/13/2010 | |
2010-05-07 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/10/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/28/2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/28/2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/27/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 00 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/17/2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/10/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/10/2010 | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/03/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/3/2010 | |
2010-02-18 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 02/24/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3659 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1128