TN SB3427 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1127
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1127
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires each local board of education to develop a policy by which students' TCAP test scores for grades 3-8 will comprise 15 to 25 percent of the student's final grade for the spring semester in the subject areas of mathematics, reading/language arts, and science and social studies; revises provisions governing when TCAP exams are to be administered. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires each local board of education to develop a policy by which students' TCAP test scores for grades 3-8 will comprise 15 to 25 percent of the student's final grade for the spring semester in the subject areas of mathematics, reading/language arts, and science and social studies; revises provisions governing when TCAP exams are to be administered. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Lowe Finney [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Pub. Ch. 1127 | |
2010-07-06 | Effective date(s) 07/01/10 | |
2010-06-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-23 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-22 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-16 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-14 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-06-08 | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-08 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1351) | |
2010-06-08 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1352) | |
2010-06-08 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - HA1631) | |
2010-06-08 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-06-04 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-06-04 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-04 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1156) | |
2010-06-04 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - SA1541) | |
2010-06-04 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1183) | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/04/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (3) cal. for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (3) cal. for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2010-05-28 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/01/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/26/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 5/27/10 | |
2010-04-07 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 00 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-04-05 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 04/05/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/17/2010 | |
2010-02-18 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 02/24/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3545 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1127