TN SB3219 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1124
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1124
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, deletes the requirement that a person being photographed must be readily identifiable in order for the offense of unlawful photographing to be committed; redefines "penal institution" for purposes of the provisions regarding obstruction of justice. - Amends amend TCA Title 39.
Title
As enacted, deletes the requirement that a person being photographed must be readily identifiable in order for the offense of unlawful photographing to be committed; redefines "penal institution" for purposes of the provisions regarding obstruction of justice. - Amends amend TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-04 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-04 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Pub. Ch. 1124 | |
2010-07-06 | Effective date(s) 01/01/11 | |
2010-06-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-23 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-22 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-16 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-14 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-06-08 | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2010-06-08 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1654) | |
2010-06-08 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-06-07 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-06-05 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-05 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1582) | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/05/2010 | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 06/04/2010 | |
2010-06-04 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/04/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | Action def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/4/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 06/03/10 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 06/02/10 | |
2010-05-28 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/01/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Action def. in S. FW&M Comm to 06/01/10 | |
2010-05-27 | Action def. in FW&M Com. to 5/27/10 | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/26/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3277 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1124