TN SB3125 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1144
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1144
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the provision of group medical health insurance for support staff of an LEA. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 27, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the provision of group medical health insurance for support staff of an LEA. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 27, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 3 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Pub. Ch. 1144 | |
2010-07-06 | Effective date(s) 06/30/10 | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-23 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-22 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-16 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-14 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-06-09 | S. concurred in H. am. 3 | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (2) cal. for 06/09/2010 | |
2010-06-08 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 79, Nays 11, PNV 1 | |
2010-06-08 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - HA1666) | |
2010-06-08 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1286) | |
2010-06-08 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1132) | |
2010-06-08 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-06-04 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-06-03 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA1179) | |
2010-06-03 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1141) | |
2010-06-03 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1021) | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (3) cal. for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (3) cal. for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-05-28 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/01/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/26/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 5/27/10 | |
2010-05-05 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. / Behind Budget | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/05/2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/5/2010 | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/04/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 10 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-04-05 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 04/05/2010 | |
2010-03-22 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 03/22/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/24/2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3193 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1144