TN SB3060 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 804
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, expands list of animal related practices that are exempt from veterinarian licensure requirements. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 12.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, expands list of animal related practices that are exempt from veterinarian licensure requirements. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 12.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-27 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 804
2010-04-05 Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1061)
2010-04-05 Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
2010-04-05 Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/05/2010
2010-03-24 Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 00
2010-03-19 Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 03/24/2010
2010-01-28 P2C, ref. to S.GW,H&HR Comm.
2010-01-27 Intro., P1C.
2010-01-27 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB3491 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 804

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback