TN SB3049 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1142
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1142
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions of the Tennessee Small Business Investment Company Credit Act. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 28 and Title 56.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions of the Tennessee Small Business Investment Company Credit Act. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 28 and Title 56.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE AMEND# 5 BY Beavers (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-12 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE AMEND# 5 BY Beavers (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-12 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Pub. Ch. 1142 | |
2010-07-06 | Effective date(s) 06/30/10 | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-23 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-22 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-09 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-06-05 | S. concurred in H. am. 2 | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 06/05/2010 | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 06/04/2010 | |
2010-06-04 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 79, Nays 13, PNV 2 | |
2010-06-04 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA1597) | |
2010-06-04 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1485) | |
2010-06-04 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-05-27 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-05-24 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-05-24 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 25, Nays 7 | |
2010-05-24 | Am. 6 tabled | |
2010-05-24 | Am. 7 tabled | |
2010-05-24 | Am. 5 tabled | |
2010-05-24 | Am. 4 tabled | |
2010-05-24 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - SA1447) | |
2010-05-24 | Am. 2 tabled | |
2010-05-24 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1231) | |
2010-05-24 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 of 1 - SA1472) | |
2010-05-20 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/24/2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 3 PNV 0 | |
2010-05-12 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/12/2010 | |
2010-05-11 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/12/2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/11/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 10 | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 4/6/2010 | |
2010-03-29 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-29 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/29/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2927 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1142