TN SB2987 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires any public water system or waterworks system that discontinues the fluoridation of its water supply to give notice of such discontinuance to applicable state agencies and affected customers. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 221.
Title
As introduced, requires any public water system or waterworks system that discontinues the fluoridation of its water supply to give notice of such discontinuance to applicable state agencies and affected customers. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 221.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - S. E,C&T COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - S. E,C&T COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-03-04 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-03-04 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-04 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0878) | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/04/2010 | |
2010-03-02 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to Cal. Comm Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on S. E,C&T Comm. cal. for 03/02/2010 | |
2010-02-23 | Action Def. in S. Envr. Comm. to 3/2/2010 | |
2010-02-18 | Placed on S. E,C&T Comm. cal. for 02/23/2010 | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. E,C&T Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3374 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-17 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Public Health and Family Assistance of HHR of Health & Human Resources Committee