TN SB2965 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Subject to local approval, deletes the position of town marshal; requires candidates for the board of mayor and aldermen to be permanent residents of the city; changes reasons to declare a vacancy on the board of mayor and aldermen. - Amends Chapter 333 of the Private Acts of 1953; as rewritten.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Chapter 333 of the Private Acts of 1953; as rewritten by Chapter 54 of the Private Acts of 1991; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the City of Cottage Grove.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-17 Comp. became Pr. Ch. 49
2024-03-21SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2024-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Local Calendar for 3/21/2024
2024-02-26SenatePassed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill
2024-02-22SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-02-20SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2980 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Pr. Ch. 49

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback