TN SB2932 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 759
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 759
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes revisions to general law necessary to implement the annual appropriations act; requires dealers with physical presence in this state to register with department of revenue to collect and remit sales tax. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 12; Title 13; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18; Title 29; Title 33; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 42; Title 43; Title 44; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 58; Title 59; Title 60; Title 61; Title 62; Title 63; Title 64; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, makes revisions to general law necessary to implement the annual appropriations act; requires dealers with physical presence in this state to register with department of revenue to collect and remit sales tax. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 12; Title 13; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18; Title 29; Title 33; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 42; Title 43; Title 44; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 58; Title 59; Title 60; Title 61; Title 62; Title 63; Title 64; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 759 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 6/30/2020,10/1/2020 | |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-19 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-06-17 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. (Hazelwood, Hicks, M. Hill, Lamberth, Lynn, Love, Staples) |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed. (Watson, Haile, Johnson, Stevens, Gilmore, Yager) |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from its non-concurrence. |
2020-06-17 | House | H. refused to recede from am. no. 1 & 2 |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in House amendments. |
2020-06-17 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 77, Nays 17, PNV 0 |
2020-06-17 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0992) |
2020-06-17 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0988) |
2020-06-17 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-06-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0721) |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0720) |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0719) |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. Cal 6-10-20 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Appropriations Subcommittee calendar for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Refer to Senate FW&M Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Approved by Delayed Bills Committee |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Refer to Senate Delayed Bills Committee |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2924 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 759