TN SB2927 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, authorizes the mayor to designate a financial director to assist with the budget and manage all financial affairs of the city; authorizes city recorder to have a designee in the city recorder's absence at meetings. - Amends Chapter 121 of the Private Acts of 2004; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, authorizes the mayor to designate a financial director to assist with the budget and manage all financial affairs of the city; authorizes city recorder to have a designee in the city recorder's absence at meetings. - Amends Chapter 121 of the Private Acts of 2004; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 56 | |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 6/17/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2928 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Pr. Ch. 56