TN SB2922 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department to include in its training curriculum for emergency medical services personnel materials concerning child abuse and neglect. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 63 and Title 68, Chapter 140.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 63 and Title 68, Chapter 140, relative to emergency services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-19SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2024-03-14SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2024-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/19/2024
2024-03-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/20/2024
2024-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/13/2024
2024-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2024-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2899 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback