TN SB2916 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, changes from 60 days to 75 days prior to the beginning of the fiscal year the time in which the president of the metropolitan airport authority must submit the annual operating budget to the board for approval. - Amends TCA Title 42, Chapter 3 and Title 42, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 42, Chapter 3 and Title 42, Chapter 4, relative to airport authority boards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-13SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2024-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/13/2024
2024-03-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/13/2024
2024-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/6/2024
2024-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2024-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2717 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback