TN SB2914 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, changes from January 15 to January 1, the beginning date of each year at which time the department of transportation may reduce the maximum weight of vehicle loads if necessary to protect the streets, roads, highways, or other public thoroughfares from unnecessary injury or damage. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 47; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 65; Title 66 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 47; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 65; Title 66 and Title 67, relative to transportation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-06SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2024-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/6/2024
2024-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2024-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2274 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback